TN HB1885 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that the Class C misdemeanor offense of carrying a firearm, knife or club with intent to go armed is committed only if the person carrying the firearm, knife or club is prohibited by law from purchasing, owning or possessing a weapon. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As introduced, specifies that the Class C misdemeanor offense of carrying a firearm, knife or club with intent to go armed is committed only if the person carrying the firearm, knife or club is prohibited by law from purchasing, owning or possessing a weapon. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2014-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-22 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2591 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-13 - Ref. to S. Delayed Bills Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1885&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1885.pdf |