TN HB1654 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 692
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 692
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires an LEA in which a student is transferring to another school to send the student's records, including disciplinary records, to the school to which the student transfers; requires an LEA from which a student is transferring to another LEA to send the student's records, including disciplinary records, to the LEA to which the student transfers; requires LEAs in transferring records to comply with FERPA. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires an LEA in which a student is transferring to another school to send the student's records, including disciplinary records, to the school to which the student transfers; requires an LEA from which a student is transferring to another LEA to send the student's records, including disciplinary records, to the LEA to which the student transfers; requires LEAs in transferring records to comply with FERPA. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Coley [R] | Sen. Reginald Tate [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 692 |
2014-04-02 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-03-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/27/2014 |
2014-03-25 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Action Def. in Education Committee to 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-11 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/11/2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2014-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-16 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1786 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-22 - Pub. Ch. 692