TN HB1653 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 710
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 710
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, under certain circumstances, exempts companies that sell emergency lights and sirens to public safety and law enforcement agencies from the prohibitions on the operation, installation or use of such warning devices. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 16, Part 3; Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 2 and Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, under certain circumstances, exempts companies that sell emergency lights and sirens to public safety and law enforcement agencies from the prohibitions on the operation, installation or use of such warning devices. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 16, Part 3; Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 2 and Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Transportation Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Transportation Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 710 |
2014-03-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-03-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/12/2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2014-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-16 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1492 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-22 - Pub. Ch. 710