TN HB1565 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Failed In s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Failed In s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a prescription to dispense immediate methamphetamine precursors and makes additional related changes concerning dispensing such substances. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 53, Chapter 10; Title 53, Chapter 11 and Title 63, Chapter 10.
Title
As introduced, requires a prescription to dispense immediate methamphetamine precursors and makes additional related changes concerning dispensing such substances. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 53, Chapter 10; Title 53, Chapter 11 and Title 63, Chapter 10.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Failed In s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to last calendar |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/25/2014 |
2014-01-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2014-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee--Health |
2014-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-16 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1791 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-19 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. H&W Comm.