TN HB1564 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes local governments to lower the mandatory retirement age for POST-certified police officers from 60 to 55; authorizes local governments to allow POST-certified police officers subject to the mandatory retirement age to alternatively retire at any age, if they have 30 years of service. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 25; Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36; Title 8, Chapter 37; Title 11 and Title 38.
Title
As introduced, authorizes local governments to lower the mandatory retirement age for POST-certified police officers from 60 to 55; authorizes local governments to allow POST-certified police officers subject to the mandatory retirement age to alternatively retire at any age, if they have 30 years of service. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 25; Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36; Title 8, Chapter 37; Title 11 and Title 38.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed Behind the Budget |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-03-18 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/12/2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2014-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-16 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1738 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-02 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.