TN HB1494 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds certain physician assistants to those designated professionals authorized to perform the duties of a physician under portions of involuntary admission to inpatient mental health treatment statute. - Amends TCA Title 33.
Title
As enacted, adds certain physician assistants to those designated professionals authorized to perform the duties of a physician under portions of involuntary admission to inpatient mental health treatment statute. - Amends TCA Title 33.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Health Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Health Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 688 |
2014-03-10 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-03-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/10/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/6/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/26/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Action Def. in Health Committee to 2/26/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/19/2014 |
2014-02-11 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/11/2014 |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2014-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2014-01-16 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-15 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1502 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-22 - Pub. Ch. 688