TN HB1453 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires members of boards of education to have at least two years of postsecondary education; provides that current members may fulfill their terms and seek re-election. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, requires members of boards of education to have at least two years of postsecondary education; provides that current members may fulfill their terms and seek re-election. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2014-01-16 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2014-01-15 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1453&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1453.pdf |