TN HB1385 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Status: Failed on March 25 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-03-25 - Failed In s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates the "Koozer-Kuhn Medical Cannabis Act". - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 2; Title 39; Title 43; Title 53, Chapter 11; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates the "Koozer-Kuhn Medical Cannabis Act". - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 2; Title 39; Title 43; Title 53, Chapter 11; Title 63 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-25HouseFailed In s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
2014-03-19HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/25/2014
2014-03-18HouseAction Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/25/2014
2014-03-12HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/18/2014
2014-03-11HouseAction Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/18/2014
2014-03-05HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/11/2014
2014-01-15HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2014-01-15HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee--Government Operations for review
2014-01-14HouseIntro., P1C.
2014-01-02HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2451 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-06 - P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback