TN HB1380 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 690
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 690
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes requirements for inspections of funeral establishments; specifies when records must be made available; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 5, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, establishes requirements for inspections of funeral establishments; specifies when records must be made available; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 5, Part 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Business and Utilities Committe (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Business and Utilities Committe (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 690 |
2014-03-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-03-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/27/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/12/2014 |
2014-02-27 | House | Re-referred To: Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/27/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 2/19/2014 |
2014-02-11 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/11/2014 |
2014-01-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2014-01-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2014-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-12-04 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1675 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-22 - Pub. Ch. 690