TN HB1150 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits operation and maintenance of a campus police force by an institution of higher education that otherwise has statutory authority to operate a campus police force, if the institution requires a student organization to allow any student enrolled at the institution to participate in the organization regardless of the student's beliefs or status. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits operation and maintenance of a campus police force by an institution of higher education that otherwise has statutory authority to operate a campus police force, if the institution requires a student organization to allow any student enrolled at the institution to participate in the organization regardless of the student's beliefs or status. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-26HouseTaken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
2013-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/26/2013
2013-03-19HouseAction Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/26/2013
2013-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/19/2013
2013-03-12HouseAction Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/19/2013
2013-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/12/2013
2013-02-21HouseAssigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
2013-02-21HouseP2C, ref. to Education Committee
2013-02-14HouseIntro., P1C.
2013-02-13HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1241 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback