TN HB0980 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-05-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 293
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires limited lines licensure for the sale or offer of coverage under a policy of self-service storage insurance. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 6 and Title 66, Chapter 31.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires limited lines licensure for the sale or offer of coverage under a policy of self-service storage insurance. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 6 and Title 66, Chapter 31.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-10 - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-19 - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-12 - (VOICE VOTE) INSURANCE AND BANKING COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Government Operations Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-06 - (VOICE VOTE) INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Insurance and Banking Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-07HouseComp. became Pub. Ch. 293
2013-04-15HouseComp. SB subst.
2013-04-10HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2013
2013-04-09HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2013
2013-04-09HouseRec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2013-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/9/2013
2013-04-03HouseRec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2013-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2013
2013-03-27HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/3/2013
2013-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2013
2013-03-19HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2013-03-19HouseRec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2013-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/19/2013
2013-03-12HouseRec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Government Operations Committee
2013-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/12/2013
2013-03-06HouseRec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
2013-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/6/2013
2013-02-27HouseAction Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/6/2013
2013-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/27/2013
2013-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
2013-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2013-02-07HouseIntro., P1C.
2013-02-06HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1147 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-07 - Pub. Ch. 293

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback