TN HB0970 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Balance of Powers Act." - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Balance of Powers Act." - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-20 - House - STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State Government Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | Action Def. in State Government Committee to 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2013-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-02-07 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-06 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1158 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-02 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.