TN HB0553 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows charter schools to enroll any students, in addition to those presently eligible for enrollment, to the extent such students do not exceed 10 percent of the charter school's student capacity. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 13, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, allows charter schools to enroll any students, in addition to those presently eligible for enrollment, to the extent such students do not exceed 10 percent of the charter school's student capacity. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 13, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to Charter School Calendar | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/25/2009 | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to s/c K-12 of ED | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to Education | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1348 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0553&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0553.pdf |