TN HB0389 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits state agencies from accepting, applying for, using, or receiving federal funds conditioned upon unreasonably demanding terms; requires state agencies to submit a report to the fiscal review committee and office of legislative budget analysis prior to applying for federal aid concerning any conditions on the receipt and use of the funds. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 7, Part 1; Title 4, Chapter 4, Part 1; Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 51 and Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 54.
Title
As introduced, prohibits state agencies from accepting, applying for, using, or receiving federal funds conditioned upon unreasonably demanding terms; requires state agencies to submit a report to the fiscal review committee and office of legislative budget analysis prior to applying for federal aid concerning any conditions on the receipt and use of the funds. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 7, Part 1; Title 4, Chapter 4, Part 1; Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 51 and Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 54.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2013-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2014 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2013-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0470 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-18 - Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/18/2013
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0389&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0389.pdf |