TN HB0118 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-22 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-22 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a referendum process by which the electorate of a local government in this state may vote to establish 16-year term limits for the public officials of the local government. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 8.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 8, relative to term limits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - HOUSE ELECTIONS & CAMPAIGN FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/22/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 2/22/2023 |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/15/2023 |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2023-01-20 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0580 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee