TN HB0004 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-17 - Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-17 - Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the date of the repeal of the Virtual Schools Act from June 30, 2015, to June 30, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 16, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, extends the date of the repeal of the Virtual Schools Act from June 30, 2015, to June 30, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 16, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2015-01-17 | House | Ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2015-01-14 | House | P2C, held on desk - pending appointment of standing committees |
2015-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-12-05 | House | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0004&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0004.pdf |