TN HB0003 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-3)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes standards review and development committees and advisory teams comprised of Tennessee teachers, higher education faculty members, and parents to propose world-class, highly rigorous K-12 English language arts and mathematics standards for use in public schools. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2; Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 6.
Title
As introduced, establishes standards review and development committees and advisory teams comprised of Tennessee teachers, higher education faculty members, and parents to propose world-class, highly rigorous K-12 English language arts and mathematics standards for use in public schools. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2; Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 6.
Sponsors
Rep. John Forgety [R] | Rep. Beth Harwell [R] | Rep. Ron Lollar [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] |
Rep. Roger Kane [R] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Curtis Johnson [R] |
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Steve McManus [R] |
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Sen. Art Swann [R] | Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R] | Rep. Cameron Sexton [R] |
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. Timothy Wirgau [R] | Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. Charles Sargent [R] |
Rep. Gerald McCormick [R] | Rep. Harry Brooks [R] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Bill Dunn [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs |
2015-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/4/2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-18 | House | Meeting Cancelled. Reset on Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee cal. for next meeting. |
2015-02-12 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2015-02-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs SubCommittee for 2/18/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2015-02-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs SubCommittee to 2/18/2015 |
2015-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2015-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs SubCommittee for 2/11/2015 |
2015-02-04 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2015-02-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs SubCommittee |
2015-01-17 | House | Ref. to Education Instruction & Programs--Finance |
2015-01-14 | House | P2C, held on desk - pending appointment of standing committees |
2015-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-12-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2014-11-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2014-11-17 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0005 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-09 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0003&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0003.pdf |