SD SB94 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2024 S.J. 422
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2024 S.J. 422
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend provisions pertaining to the partners in education tax credit program.
Title
Amend provisions pertaining to the partners in education tax credit program.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Hansen [R] | Sen. Lee Schoenbeck [R] | Sen. Arch Beal [R] | Sen. Brent Hoffman [R] |
Sen. Jim Mehlhaff [R] | Rep. Rebecca Reimer [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Rep. Tony Venhuizen [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2024 S.J. 422 |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 23, 2024 S.J. 397 |
2024-02-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 382 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 380 |
2024-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 3. H.J. 361 |
2024-02-15 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 348 |
2024-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 337 |
2024-02-13 | House | Remove from Consent Calendar H.J. 319 |
2024-02-12 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-02-12 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-31 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 216 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 1. S.J. 205 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 94A |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-18 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 107 |