SD SB16 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Board of Regents to purchase improved real property in Brookings County and to make an appropriation therefor.
Title
Authorize the Board of Regents to purchase improved real property in Brookings County and to make an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 688 |
2014-03-13 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 652 |
2014-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 750 |
2014-03-11 | House | Signed by President S.J. 629 |
2014-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 5. H.J. 690 |
2014-03-06 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 671 |
2014-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 659 |
2014-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 637 |
2014-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 620 |
2014-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 594 |
2014-02-26 | House | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. H.J. 566 |
2014-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-05 | House | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 293 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 208 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 180 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 16 |