SD SB142 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 18, NAYS 15. S.J. 315
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 18, NAYS 15. S.J. 315
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increase legislative salaries subject to certain conditions and restrictions.
Title
Increase legislative salaries subject to certain conditions and restrictions.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Sen. Thomas Jones [D] | Sen. Al Novstrup [R] |
Sen. David Omdahl [R] | Sen. Bruce Rampelberg [R] | Sen. David Novstrup [R] | Rep. Charles Hoffman [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 18, NAYS 15. S.J. 315 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 300 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 265 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 184 |