SD SB136 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ensure available replacement parts and services for consumers of manufactured goods.
Title
Ensure available replacement parts and services for consumers of manufactured goods.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 380 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 136yb |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Deferred by Chair, Passed |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Deferred by Chair, Passed |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 182 |