SD SB127 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 17, NAYS 17. S.J. 350
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 17, NAYS 17. S.J. 350
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to fund the Teach for America grant program.
Title
Make an appropriation to fund the Teach for America grant program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Reconsidered (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Reconsidered (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 17, NAYS 17. S.J. 350 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 287 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 287 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Intent to reconsider S.J. 276 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 22, NAYS 10. S.J. 276 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 275 Amendment 127ob |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 262 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. S.J. 221 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 127oa |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 169 |