SD SB107 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 730
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 730
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Accommodate legislation on the state aid to education formula and to make an appropriation therefor.
Title
Accommodate legislation on the state aid to education formula and to make an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Tabled (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | House | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 730 |
2014-03-10 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 676 |
2014-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 533 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 437 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 401 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-29 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 154 |