SD HCR1006 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-20)
Status: Enrolled on February 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 335
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 335
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
In opposition to certain actions by animal rights groups to undermine agricultural producers.
Title
In opposition to certain actions by animal rights groups to undermine agricultural producers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 335 | |
2012-02-08 | Introduced S.J. 318 | |
2012-02-07 | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 334 | |
2012-02-06 | Introduced H.J. 312 |