SD HB1204 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 623
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 623
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require the Board of Education to obtain legislative approval before adopting any further Common Core standards, and to repeal a provision requiring the board to conduct certain public hearings.
Title
Require the Board of Education to obtain legislative approval before adopting any further Common Core standards, and to repeal a provision requiring the board to conduct certain public hearings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 28 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 36 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 28 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 36 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | Senate | Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 623 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-21 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 523 |
2013-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 41. H.J. 471 |
2013-02-20 | House | Intent to reconsider H.J. 461 |
2013-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 36, NAYS 32. H.J. 460 |
2013-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 443 |
2013-02-15 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 7. H.J. 420 |
2013-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 207 |