SD HB1148 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a license for certain businesses to allow patrons to manufacture malt beverages and wines on the licensed premises for personal use.
Title
Provide a license for certain businesses to allow patrons to manufacture malt beverages and wines on the licensed premises for personal use.
Sponsors
Rep. Melissa Magstadt [R] | Rep. Scott Ecklund [R] | Sen. Kris Langer [R] | Rep. Roger Solum [R] |
Sen. Ried Holien [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 790 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 773 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 653 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 750 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 616 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 602 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 575 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 562 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 540 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 524 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 501 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 491 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 445 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-07 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 259 |
2014-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 317 |
2014-02-05 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-02-05 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 288 |
2014-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-29 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 150 |