SC S1341 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-08 - Act No. 302
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-08 - Act No. 302
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establish The Barnwell County School Consolidation Study Committee To Explore The Consolidation Of The Three Present School Districts Of The County, To Provide For The Membership Of The Committee And The Issues It Shall Consider, And To Provide That The Committee Is Dissolved Upon The Submission Of Its Report To The County Legislative Delegation Which Must Be Submitted No Later Than March 1, 2015
Title
Barnwell County School Consolidation Planning Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 55) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-08 | Act No. 302 | |
2014-06-13 | Effective date 06/06/14 | |
2014-06-06 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Ratified R 290 | |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2014-06-05 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2014-06-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-64 Nays-0 |
2014-06-04 | House | Read second time |
2014-06-04 | House | Amended |
2014-06-03 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |