SC S1189 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Act No. 236
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Act No. 236
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Public Service Commission Shall Promulgate Standards For Interconnection Of Renewable Energy Facilities And Other Nonutility-owned Generation With A Generation Capacity Of Two Thousand Kilowatts Or Less To An Electrical Utility's Distribution System And To Provide That No Customer-generator Or Customer-generator Lessee Shall Connect Or Operate An Electric Generation Unit In Parallel Phase And Synchronization With Any Electrical Utility Without Written Approval By The Electrical Utility That All Of The Commission's Requirements Have Been Met; To Provide That Each Distribution Electric Cooperative Board Shall Consider Certain General Objectives And Methodology In Adopting A Net Energy Metering Policy, And To Provide That Each Distribution Electric Cooperative Shall Adopt A Net Energy Metering Policy And Shall Report Their Policy To The Office Of Regulatory Staff Within One Year; To Provide That Each Electric Cooperative Shall Investigate The Relationship Between Fixed Costs, Fixed Charges, And The Extent Of Cost Shifting That Is Attributable To Distributed Energy Resources Within Current Cost Of Service Ratemaking Methodologies, Cost Allocations, And Rate Designs, With A Focus On The Implications Distributed Energy Resources Could Have For Their Business Models In The Future; To Provide That If The Application Of The Provisions Of This Act To Any Wholesale Electrical Contract Existing On The Date Of Its Adoption Is Determined To Impair Unlawfully Any Term Of Such Contract Or To Add Material Costs To Either Party, Then That Contract Is Exempt From The Provisions Of This Act Under Certain Conditions; And To Provide How Certain Provisions Of The Act Must Be Construed
Title
Distributed Energy Resource Program Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Act No. 236 | |
2014-06-13 | Effective date 06/02/14 | |
2014-06-02 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-05-29 | Ratified R 241 | |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2014-05-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-86 Nays-0 |
2014-05-22 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2014-05-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2014-05-21 | House | Read second time |
2014-05-21 | House | Amended |
2014-05-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-05-15 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2014-04-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2014-04-30 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-04-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Amended |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Committee report: Majority favorable, minority unfavorable Judiciary |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Polled out of committee Judiciary |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 27 | 1050 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 27 | 460 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 27 | 865 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |