SC S1065 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Act No. 226
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Act No. 226
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide For The Limited Licensing Of Self-storage Facilities To Sell Or Offer Insurance
Title
Self-Storage facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Act No. 226 | |
2014-06-13 | Effective date 06/02/14 | |
2014-06-02 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-05-29 | Ratified R 231 | |
2014-05-22 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2014-05-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-2 |
2014-05-21 | House | Read second time |
2014-05-15 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2014-03-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2014-03-20 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |