SC S0718 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-27 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-27 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That A Driver Of A Motor Vehicle May Be Found Liable Of A Civil Penalty For Violations Regarding Passing Or Overtaking A School Bus If The Violation Is Captured On A Video Recording Device Mounted On The School Bus, To Provide Penalties, And To Provide The Evidentiary Process And The Process By Which A Person Receives Service Of Process.
Title
Passing a school bus violation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-05-27 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |