SC S0406 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly

Status

Status: Engrossed on April 10 2013 - 50% progress
Action: 2013-04-11 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Alphabetize These Listings And To Add Drugs To These Designations To Conform To Federal Drug Designations And Designations Of Adjacent States In Order To Enhance And Improve Illicit Drug Enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schedule I, II, III, IV, and V controlled substances

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-09 - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-11HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2013-04-11HouseIntroduced and read first time
2013-04-10SenateRead third time and sent to House
2013-04-09SenateRoll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
2013-04-09SenateRead second time
2013-04-09SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2013-03-21SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
2013-02-21SenateCommitted to Committee on Medical Affairs
2013-02-21SenateRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2013-02-20SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2013-02-20SenateIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

H3823 (Similar To) 2014-01-15 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
H3823 (Similar To) 2014-01-15 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
44531510(n/a)See Bill Text
4453190(n/a)See Bill Text
4453210(n/a)See Bill Text
4453230(n/a)See Bill Text
4453250(n/a)See Bill Text
4453270(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback