SC S0143 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-10 - Act No. 100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-10 - Act No. 100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide For The Governance Of Nonprobate Transfers, And To Amend The South Carolina Trust Code
Title
Probate Code
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Malloy [D] | Sen. Robert Ford [D] | Sen. Shane Massey [R] | Sen. Shane Martin [R] |
Sen. Robert Hayes [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-10 | Act No. 100 | |
2013-07-10 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2013-06-07 | Signed By Governor | |
2013-06-04 | Ratified R 46 | |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-1 |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2013-05-21 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2013-05-16 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2013-05-16 | House | Read second time |
2013-05-16 | House | Amended |
2013-05-15 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-16-13 |
2013-05-14 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-15-13 |
2013-04-30 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-14-13 |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-21 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-1 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Massey, S.Martin, Bennett, Johnson |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2012-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2012-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled |