SC H5096 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Fill The Terms Which Expire June 30, 2019.
Title
Elections
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Clemmons [R] | Rep. David Mack [D] | Rep. Bruce Bannister [R] | Rep. William Whitmire [R] |
Rep. Phyllis Henderson [R] | Rep. Peter McCoy [R] | Rep. Gregory Delleney [R] | Rep. William Sandifer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Senate | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence |
2014-04-10 | House | Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate |
Same As/Similar To
S1217 (Similar To) 2014-04-29 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=5096&session=120&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/5096_20140410.htm |