SC H5084 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-08 - Act No. 322
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-08 - Act No. 322
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
A Joint Resolution Directing The State Budget And Control Board To Transfer From The State Of South Carolina To The City Of Greenville Two Properties In The City Of Greenville, One Located At The Corner Of North Church Street And East Park Avenue And An Adjacent Property On East Park Avenue, Which Were Previously Used As A State National Guard Armory
Title
Budget and Control Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-08 | Act No. 322 | |
2014-06-13 | Effective date 06/06/14 | |
2014-06-06 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Ratified R 311 | |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Finance |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-04-30 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-04-29 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2014-04-29 | House | Read second time |
2014-04-09 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |