SC H4384 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-05 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-05 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That A Person Operating A Moped And His Passenger Must Wear Reflective Vests, To Require That A Moped Sold In This State Must Be Equipped With A Rear Red Tail Light That Flashes Continually While The Moped Is In Motion, And To Require A Moped's Rear Red Tail Light That Flashes Continually To Be Turned On At All Times While The Moped Is In Operation.
Title
Mopeds
Sponsors
Rep. William Whitmire [R] | Rep. Mike Ryhal [R] | Rep. Wayne George [D] | Rep. Alan Clemmons [R] |
Sen. Stephen Goldfinch [R] | Rep. Heather Crawford [R] | Rep. Kevin Hardee [R] | Rep. Liston Barfield [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 76 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-02-05 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-02-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-76 Nays-40 |
2014-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-04 | House | Amended |
2014-02-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: George, Clemmons, Goldfinch, H.A.Crawford, Hardee, Barfield |
2014-01-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2014-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ryhal |
2014-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2013-12-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2013-12-03 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
56 | 5 | 3710 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 3720 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 3730 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |