SC H4223 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 49-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-20 - Roll call Ayes-32 Nays-10
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-20 - Roll call Ayes-32 Nays-10
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Enact The "south Carolina Pain-capable Unborn Child Protection Act", To Provide Findings Of The General Assembly, To Provide Necessary Terms, To Provide A Physician Or Allied Health Professional Shall Calculate The Probable Post-fertilization Age Of An Embryo Or Fetus Before Performing Or Inducing An Abortion, To Provide That An Abortion May Not Be Performed If The Probable Post-fertilization Age Of The Embryo Or Fetus Is Twenty Or More Weeks, To Provide For Exceptions, To Require Certain Educational Materials Be Produced And Distributed, And To Provide The Act Does Not Implicitly Or Otherwise Repeal Another Provision Of Law.
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-20 - Senate - Senate: To Set For Special Order (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 81 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 84 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 81 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 84 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-32 Nays-10 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Special order, set for May 20, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Medical Affairs |
2014-03-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-03-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-81 Nays-22 |
2014-03-20 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-03-19 | House | Roll call Yeas-84 Nays-29 |
2014-03-19 | House | Read second time |
2014-03-19 | House | Amended |
2014-03-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Goldfinch |
2014-03-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Barfield |
2014-03-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning, Crosby |
2014-03-05 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-18-14 |
2014-03-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Putnam |
2014-02-27 | House | Requests for debate-Rep(s). Delleney, Hiott, Skelton, Atwater, Beddingfield, Hixon, Bannister, Hamilton, Hardwick, Goldfinch, Clemmons, GR Smith, Stringer, Loftis, Henderson, Nanney, Lucas, Tallon, Wood, Cole, Allison, Forrester, RL Brown, VS Moss, Weeks, McCoy |
2014-02-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon, J.R.Smith |
2014-02-26 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2014-02-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis |
2014-02-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder, Hiott, Taylor, Bowen |
2014-02-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole, Forrester |
2014-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Harrell |
2014-02-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hamilton |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-05-23 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0626 (Similar To) 2013-04-16 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs