SC H3395 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 77-46)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Bridge In Cherokee County That Crosses The Norfolk Southern Railway Tracks Along United States Highway 29 The "edna H. Hamrick Memorial Bridge" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Bridge That Contain The Words "edna H. Hamrick Memorial Bridge".
Title
Edna H. Hamrick Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-21 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-01-29 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2013-01-24 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2013-01-23 | House | Introduced |