SC H3195 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarify The Type Of Prohibited Expenses.
Title
Acts prohibited of lobbyist principals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-02-12 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-02-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0 |
2015-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Amended |
2015-02-11 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2015-02-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Knight |
2015-02-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-02-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hicks |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2015-02-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks, W.J.McLeod, Whipper |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-12-18 | House | Prefiled |