SC H3179 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That Applications Must Be Filed On Or Before February First And To Provide That Late Filings May Result In Sanctioning Of The Registrant.
Title
S.C. Board of Accountancy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-02-11 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-02-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2015-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-10 | House | Amended |
2015-02-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bales, Anthony |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2014-12-11 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0301 (Similar To) 2015-06-09 - Act No. 51
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 2 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 250 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 255 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |