SC H3133 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Corbin, Young
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Corbin, Young
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That A County Solicitor Must Petition The Family Court To Require A Person To Continue To Register As A Sex Offender Who Is A Registered Juvenile Sex Offender, Who Is At Least Twenty-one Years Of Age, Or Has Been Released From The Custody Of The Department Of Juvenile Justice, To Provide That The Person Must Continue To Register As A Sex Offender If The Family Court Determines That He Is Likely To Or Poses An Ongoing Threat To The Public, And To Provide That If No Petition Is Filed Within Ninety Days Following The Twenty-first Birthday Of The Person Or The Date Of His Release From Custody, Or If The Family Court Determines That The Person Is Not Likely To Or Does Not Pose A Threat To The Public, Then The Person Is No Longer Required To Register As A Sex Offender And His Information Must Be Deleted From The Sex Offender Registry.
Title
Sex offenders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Corbin, Young |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-05-17 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-05-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-67 Nays-30 |
2016-05-05 | House | Read second time |
2016-05-05 | House | Amended |
2016-05-04 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2016-02-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Alexander |
2015-05-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-05-21 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-20 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-12-11 | House | Prefiled |