SC H3121 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - Committed to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - Committed to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That Points Must Be Assessed Against The Driving Record Of A Person Convicted Of Improper Use Of An Electronic Communication Device While Driving A Motor Vehicle.
Title
Electronic communication devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-06 - House - House: Table The Motion To Recommit The Bill (Y: 30 N: 68 NV: 5 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | House | Committed to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-02-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2012-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2012-12-11 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3858 (Similar To) 2013-04-17 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
56 | 1 | 720 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 3890 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 3895 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 3897 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |