SC H3116 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly

Status

Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2013-02-26 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Goldfinch
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enact The "south Carolina Fair Tax Act", To Provide For The Purposes Of The Act And Definitions, To Provide For Judicial Guidance For Interpretation Of The Act And The Imposition Of The Tax, To Provide For Credits And Refunds, To Provide For A Family Consumption Allowance, To Provide For The Administration Of The Tax By The Department Of Revenue, To Provide For Penalties For Violations Of The Act, And To Provide For Collections, Appeals, And Taxpayer Rights; To Provide For Special Rules Related To Intermediate Sales, Taxable Gaming Services, Purchases By The Federal Government, Government Enterprises, Mixed-use Property Or Services, And Not-for-profit Organizations; To Provide For Taxation Of Financial Intermediation Services, To Provide For Additional Matters Related To The Sale Of A Copyright Or Trademark, Certain Exclusions From Taxation, Taxation Related To The Purchase Of Taxable Property Or Services Subject To An Employee Discount, Taxable Property Or Services Given As A Gift, Prize, Reward, Or As Remuneration For Employment By A Registered Person, And To Provide For Tax Treatment For Inventory Held By A Trade Or Business On The Close Of Business On December Thirty-first Of The Year That This Act Is Enacted; To Provide For Funding To The Homestead Exemption Fund, The State Public School Building Fund, The South Carolina Education Improvement Act Of 1984 Fund, Funding For Municipalities And Counties, And The Tourism Expenditure Review Committee; To Provide For A Special Vote To Amend Or Repeal This Act Within Three Years Of Its Enactment And Referendum For Changes After The Fourth Year; And To Repeal Chapters 6, 8, 11, 13, 16, 36, 58, And 62 Of Title 12 Relating To The South Carolina Income Tax, And Income Tax Withholding, The Bank Tax, The Building And Loan Association Tax, The South Carolina Estate Tax, The South Carolina Sales Tax, The Taxpayer Bill Of Rights, And The South Carolina Motion Picture Incentive Act All Replaced By The Provisions Of The South Carolina Fair Tax Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair Tax Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Goldfinch
2013-02-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Herbkersman, Newton
2013-02-07HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Crosby, Norman
2013-02-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Patrick, Lowe, Whitmire, Southard, Limehouse, McCoy, Barfield, Gagnon, Henderson, Tallon, Cole
2013-02-05HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: G.M.Smith, Lucas, Delleney, Kennedy, Huggins, Nanney, Chumley, Brannon, Erickson, Pitts, Willis, Toole, Pope, Quinn, Bingham, D.C.Moss, Clemmons, Putnam, G.R.Smith, Hamilton, V.S.Moss, Allison, Forrester
2013-01-31HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Rivers, Wood
2013-01-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Atwater
2013-01-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hardwick, Spires, Sottile, J.R.Smith, Hixon, Simrill
2013-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2013-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2012-12-11HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2012-12-11HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0185 (Similar To) 2013-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Finance
S0185 (Similar To) 2013-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Finance

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback