SC H3101 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 1 2013 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-03-19 - Roll call Ayes-9 Nays-33
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Render Null And Void Certain Unconstitutional Laws Enacted By The Congress Of The United States Taking Control Over The Health Insurance Industry And Mandating That Individuals Purchase Health Insurance Under Threat Of Penalty; To Prohibit Certain Individuals From Enforcing Or Attempting To Enforce Such Unconstitutional Laws; And To Establish Criminal Penalties And Civil Liability For Violating This Article.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Freedom of Health Care Protection Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-19 - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 9 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - Senate: To Adjourn (Y: 11 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - Senate: Rule 15a (Y: 25 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate: Rule 15a (Y: 21 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-30 - Senate: To Set For Special Order (Y: 28 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate: Motion To Recall (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 65 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 74 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 12 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-19SenateRoll call Ayes-9 Nays-33
2014-03-19SenateSecond Reading Failed
2014-03-13SenateDebate interrupted
2014-03-12SenateDebate interrupted
2014-03-11SenateDebate interrupted
2014-03-05SenateDebate interrupted
2014-03-04SenateDebate interrupted
2013-05-30SenateRoll call Ayes-28 Nays-16
2013-05-30SenateSpecial order, set for May 30, 2013
2013-05-29SenateRoll call Ayes-26 Nays-19
2013-05-29SenateRecalled from Committee on Finance
2013-05-02SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2013-05-02SenateIntroduced and read first time
2013-05-01HouseRoll call Yeas-65 Nays-39
2013-05-01HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2013-05-01HouseDebate adjourned
2013-04-26 Scrivener's error corrected
2013-04-25HouseRoll call Yeas-65 Nays-34
2013-04-25HouseRead second time
2013-04-25HouseAmended
2013-04-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Brannon
2013-04-17HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning
2013-04-16HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2013-04-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Horne
2013-04-11HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Delleney
2013-04-10HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2013-04-10HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Tallon, Kennedy, Allison, Murphy
2013-03-20HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Stringer, Hamilton, Burns
2013-01-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: H.A.Crawford
2013-01-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Owens, Barfield
2013-01-17HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: V.S.Moss
2013-01-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Putnam
2013-01-10HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Nanney, Pitts
2013-01-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bedingfield, D.C.Moss, Loftis
2013-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2013-01-09HouseRecalled from Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2013-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2013-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2012-12-11HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2012-12-11HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0147 (Similar To) 2013-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
S0147 (Similar To) 2013-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3101&session=120&summary=B
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3101_20121211.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3101_20130410.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3101_20130425.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3101_20130426.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3101_20130529.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=6050
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=6103
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=6141
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=6466
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=6508
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=7552
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=7581
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=7583
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=7588

Bill Comments

feedback