SC H3036 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Act No. 171
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Act No. 171
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Declare January Seventeenth Of Each Year As "eartha Kitt Day" In South Carolina In Honor Of The Late Eartha Mae Kitt, Nationally And Internationally Known Actress, Singer, And Native South Carolinian And To Promote Cultural Tourism In The State In Order To Enhance The Economic Well-being And Improve The Quality Of Life Of All South Carolinians
Title
Eartha Kitt Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Act No. 171 | |
2016-05-18 | Effective date 05/12/16 | |
2016-05-12 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-05-11 | Ratified R 181 | |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-34 Nays-6 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-03-11 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-03-10 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-03-10 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2016-03-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-0 |
2016-03-10 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-09 | House | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-12-11 | House | Prefiled |