SC H3022 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-25 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hicks
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-25 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hicks
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibit The Use Of Taxpayer Funds And Payment Of Government Salaries And Benefits For Activities Related To The Licensing And Support Of Same-sex Marriage, To Prohibit Government Employees From Recognizing, Granting, Or Enforcing Same-sex Marriage Licenses, To Prohibit The Use Of Taxes Or Other Public Funds To Enforce A Court Order To Issue A Same-sex Marriage License, To Require Courts To Dismiss Certain Legal Actions Related To The Licensing And Recognition Of Same-sex Marriage And To Award Attorney's Fees And Costs In Those Actions, And To Provide For The Protection Of The State From Liability For Certain Conduct.
Title
Prohibit recognition and benefits to same-sex marriage persons
Sponsors
Rep. William Chumley [R] | Rep. Garry Smith [R] | Rep. James Burns [R] | Rep. Jonathon Hill [R] |
Rep. Joshua Putnam [R] | Rep. Merita Allison [R] | Rep. Joseph Daning [R] | Rep. Donna Wood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hicks |
2015-03-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning |
2015-03-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Allison |
2015-02-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill, Putnam |
2015-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Burns |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-12-11 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3022&session=121&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/3022_20141211.htm |