RI S3100 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Proclaiming September 25, 2014, To Be "ataxia Awareness Day" In The State Of Rhode Island
Title
Senate Resolution Proclaiming September 25, 2014, To Be "ataxia Awareness Day" In The State Of Rhode Island
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] | Sen. David Bates [R] | Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/16/2014) |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S3100.pdf |