RI S2885 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-04 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-04 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Amending The Charter Of North Providence
Title
Amending The Charter Of North Providence
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Edward O'Neil [I] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Charter of north providence approval of amendment lc 005276/2 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Charter of north providence lay on desk (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Charter of north providence lay on desk (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-04 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-18 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-06-12 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/12/2014) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate held on desk |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/13/2014) |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2014) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |