RI S2832 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on March 28 2012 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-12 - Committee recommended indefinite postponement
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Financial Institutions - Deferred Presentment Transactions (would Provide For Separate Licensing Requirements For Check Cashers And Pay Day Lenders. This Act Would Also Create The Pay Day Lending Law In Order To Subject Pay Day Lenders To Various Consumer Protecting Provisions.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Financial Institutions - Deferred Presentment Transactions (would Provide For Separate Licensing Requirements For Check Cashers And Pay Day Lenders. This Act Would Also Create The Pay Day Lending Law In Order To Subject Pay Day Lenders To Various Consumer Protecting Provisions.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-12 Committee recommended indefinite postponement
2012-06-12 Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2012)
2012-05-07 Meeting postponed (05/10/2012)
2012-05-04 Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2012-04-03 Committee recommended measure be held for further study
2012-03-29 Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2012)
2012-03-28 Introduced, referred to Senate Corporations

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback