RI S2818 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow David Lamontagne to join Avril Bentley and Maria Alexandria Nunez in marriage on or about September 7, 2014, within the Town of Bristol, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-04-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-04-30 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (04/30/2014) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2014) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/10/2014) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2014) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |