RI S2805 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Create and establish the Tiverton wastewater district.
Title
To Create And Establish The Tiverton Wastewater District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - The tiverton wastewater district approval of amendment lc 005201/2 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-17 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2014) |
2014-06-10 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-05-29 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/29/2014) |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/20/2014) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2014) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |